Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Person in a Position of Authority - Sexual Offenses With a Minor
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Foley, D. Jones, Kelly, Lopez, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Ruth, Simpson, Ziegler, Arikan, Bartlett, Embry, Kaufman, Munoz, Phillips, Taylor, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "person in a position of authority" applicable to sexual offense in the fourth degree; altering a certain prohibition against a certain person in a position of authority engaging in certain conduct to prohibit a person in a position of authority from engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a minor who is or was enrolled at a school or participating in a certain program for which the person in authority was working at a certain time; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0021
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0223 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2023
Legislative Date
1/23/2023
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203420/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2023 1/23/2023 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Person in a Position of Authority - Sexual Offenses With a Minor
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2023 3/06/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Favorable with Amendments {203420/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Person in a Position of Authority - Sexual Offenses With a Minor
House 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2023 3/04/2023 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/17/2023 9:34 AM
Click to return on the top page