Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland State Parks - Funds and Plan Alterations
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee and Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Natural Resources)
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the date by which the Park System Critical Maintenance Fund must be expended to before July 1, 2029; authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to expend up to $400,000 from the Park System Critical Maintenance Fund under certain circumstances; authorizing the Park System Capital Improvements and Acquisition Fund to be used for State projects on lands managed by the Department for public purposes; authorizing the Great Maryland Outdoors Fund to be used for promoting outdoor environmental education in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0259
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/15/2023
Legislative Date
9/15/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Maryland State Parks - Funds and Plan Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Maryland State Parks - Funds and Plan Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443028/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-11)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/15/2023 9/15/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Natural Resources - Maryland State Parks - Funds and Plan Alterations
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {793025/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Maryland State Parks - Funds and Plan Alterations
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments {443028/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Third Reading Passed (33-11) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Maryland State Parks - Funds and Plan Alterations
Last Updated: 4/17/2024 1:21 PM
Click to return on the top page