Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales - Owner-Occupied Property - Foreclosure, Notice, and Reimbursement of Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Ebersole, Fair, Grossman, Hill, McCaskill, McComas, Taveras, and Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending from 4 months to 6 months the amount of time that has to pass after a tax sale before the holder of the certificate of sale of the property may be reimbursed for certain expenses when the property is redeemed.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2023
Legislative Date
1/23/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273620/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2023
Legislative Date
3/23/2023
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2023 1/23/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax - Deadline Extension for Homeowners to Redeem Property Involved in a Tax Sale
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2023 3/06/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Favorable with Amendments {273620/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tax Sales - Owner-Occupied Property - Foreclosure, Notice, and Reimbursement of Expenses
House 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2023 3/04/2023 Referred Budget and Taxation 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2023 3/23/2023 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/24/2023 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page