Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing all counties, rather than counties with fewer than a certain number of registered voters, to establish one early voting center in addition to the number of early voting centers the county is required to establish if the State Board of Elections, in collaboration with the local board of elections, and the governing body of the county agree to establish an additional early voting center.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Hours of Operation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Hours of Operation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-29)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614133/1
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614133/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-3)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-18)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Hours of Operation
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Hours of Operation
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (112-29) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {614133/1 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Hayes) Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {614133/1 Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-3) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (119-18) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Establishment
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Text - Chapter - Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Establishment
(   10-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page