Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning October 1, 2021, the expungement of certain records 3 years after a disposition of the charge under certain circumstances; requiring a court to send a notice of the disposition of certain charges in a case and the date on which expungement is required to the person entitled to the expungement and certain entities; requiring a court to notify a defendant of the defendant's right to expungement under certain circumstances; requiring the court to notify the defendant by mail; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1335 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Automatic Expungement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {522011/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-36)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Automatic Expungement
House 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {522011/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-36) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Referred Rules 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
(   10-105,   10-105.1, 10-105.2 )
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:04 AM
Click to return on the top page