Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Promotion and Policy Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Long, Addison, Charles, Foley, Grossman, Holmes, Lehman, Palakovich Carr, Smith, Stewart, Toles, and Woods
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Accessory Dwelling Unit Promotion and Policy Task Force to study state and local government efforts to promote the creation of accessory dwelling units on land zoned for single-family residential use and review existing laws and policies associated with the development of accessory dwelling units throughout the State of Maryland; and requiring the Task Force to report its finding and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2024.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0382
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2023
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2023
Legislative Date
1/23/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Accessory Dwelling Unit Promotion and Policy Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2023 1/23/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Accessory Dwelling Unit Promotion and Policy Task Force
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/18/2023 10:33 AM
Click to return on the top page