Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Housing and Community Development)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain property be withheld from tax sale; authorizing a county or a municipal corporation to withhold from tax sale certain property designated for redevelopment purposes; altering certain provisions of law concerning abandoned property that is sold for less than the lien amount; altering certain requirements concerning the rate of redemption for properties sold at tax sale; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2025
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/19/2023
Legislative Date
9/19/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Tax Sales - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/19/2023 9/19/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax - Tax Sales - Revisions
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/8/2024 1:24 PM
Click to return on the top page