Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Young Readers Program and Young Readers Matching Grant Program - Alterations (Young Readers Program Act of 2023)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman and Solomon
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the Baltimore City Young Readers Program to be the Statewide Young Readers Program; establishing the Program within the Maryland State Library Agency; requiring the State Librarian to administer the Program; requiring program grant applicants to prioritize the distribution of books to children in low-income zip codes within the applicants' area of service; and requiring the State Library Board, beginning by December 1, 2024, to report every other year to the General Assembly on the effectiveness of the Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0300
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2023
Legislative Date
1/23/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393929/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2023 1/23/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City Young Readers Program - Expansion and Alterations (Young Readers Program Expansion Act of 2023)
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2023 3/06/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Favorable with Amendments {393929/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City Young Readers Program and Young Readers Matching Grant Program - Alterations (Young Readers Program Act of 2023)
House 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2023 3/04/2023 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 41 Click to view Recorded Media
(   23-110, 23-111 )
Last Updated: 3/20/2023 12:13 PM
Click to return on the top page