Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Private Well Safety Act of 2022
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Boyce, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Lehman, Ruth, and Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Hester) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Private Well Safety Program in the Department of the Environment to address and manage the contamination of certain private and domestic water supply wells in the State; establishing the Private Well Safety Fund to award grants to certain counties and households for costs associated with water quality testing and remediation; requiring the Department to utilize an online portal to receive and upload water quality testing results and certain information and to provide public access to the information; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Private Well Safety Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {223721/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (37-96)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Private Well Safety Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-33)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943628/1 Adopted
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hester) Adopted
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Private Well Safety Act of 2022
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {523322/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Floor Amendment {223721/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (37-96) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Private Well Safety Act of 2022
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (98-33) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {943628/1 Adopted 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hester) Adopted 74 Click to view Recorded Media
(   9-4A-01,   9-4A-04 through 9-4A-10, 9-4A-13 )
(   10-713 )
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 10:29 PM
Click to return on the top page