Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Transferring oversight of the inspection of the offices of dispensing physicians from the Office of Controlled Substances Administration to the State Board of Physicians; altering the circumstances under which a physician may dispense drugs, devices, or topical medications; requiring that certain appropriations be transferred to the Board on the effective date of the Act; providing for the transfer of certain functions, powers, duties, property, records, fixtures, credits, assets, liability, obligations, rights, and privileges; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0305
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513020/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513020/1 Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits
House 3/03/2022 2/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:12 PM
Click to return on the top page