Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Battery-Charged Fence Security Systems - Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegate T. Branch
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 407
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a local government to require that certain persons who provide battery-charged fence security systems comply with certain laws, require certain persons who operate or install certain security systems to obtain certain registrations or permits, require a certain installer to submit a certain affidavit, and conduct a certain inspection; authorizing a local government to issue a citation under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2020
Legislative Date
10/20/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {763725/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-16)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {697479/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Wilson, T. Branch and Adams)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Wilson, T. Branch and Adams)
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Motion to Withdraw Amendments (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 407
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2020 10/20/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Business Regulation - Battery-Charged Fence Security Systems - Regulation
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Floor Amendment {763725/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Battery-Charged Fence Security Systems - Regulation
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (122-16) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Referred Finance 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments {697479/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2021 3/16/2021 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2021 3/16/2021 House Requests Senate Recede 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2021 3/16/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Wilson, T. Branch and Adams) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 House Requests Senate Recede 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Wilson, T. Branch and Adams) 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Feldman) Adopted 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Feldman) Adopted 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Motion to Withdraw Amendments (Senator Feldman) Adopted 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Senate Recede 38AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Senate Recede 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Returned Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 407
Text - Chapter - Business Regulation - Battery-Charged Fence Security Systems - Regulation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:00 PM
Click to return on the top page