Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Gaming - Senior Activity Centers
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain senior activity center to conduct gaming events, bunco games, and card games in St. Mary's County; prohibiting a senior activity center in St. Mary's County from awarding prize money in excess of $50 to a winner in each session or charging a participant more than $25 to play one session; requiring any money that remains after prizes are awarded to be used to support future programming at the senior activity center; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Gaming - Devices and Events
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {383523/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Gaming - Senior Activity Centers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2023
Legislative Date
3/23/2023
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Gaming - Devices and Events
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Favorable with Amendments {383523/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Gaming - Senior Activity Centers
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2023 3/23/2023 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/30/2023 4:22 PM
Click to return on the top page