Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual to resume participation in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection in the Employees' Pension System or Teachers' Pension System if the individual has been separated from employment and has accrued a certain amount of eligibility service; providing for the retroactive application of the Act; requiring certain service credit earned in the Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit to be credited to the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0153
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Text - Chapter - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page