Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Producer Licensing Requirements - Education and Experience
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirements for education and experience for licensing of certain insurance producers, including producers for property and casualty insurance, life insurance, health insurance, annuities, and related products.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0336
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2024
Legislative Date
1/12/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Producer Licensing Requirements - Education and Experience
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Producer Licensing Requirements - Education and Experience
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2024 1/12/2024 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Insurance - Producer Licensing Requirements - Education and Experience
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments {253327/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Producer Licensing Requirements - Education and Experience
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Finance 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page