Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Regulations
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to adopt and maintain a written plan document for the optional retirement program; and authorizing the Board of Trustees to adopt certain regulations.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0179
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Optional Retirement Program - Regulations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Optional Retirement Program - Regulations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Optional Retirement Program - Regulations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Optional Retirement Program - Regulations
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Optional Retirement Program - Regulations
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Text - Chapter - Optional Retirement Program - Regulations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page