Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cannabis Licensing and Registration - Use of Straw Ownership - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from applying for or holding a cannabis license or registration under certain circumstances if an ownership interest in the license or registration is for the limited purpose of satisfying certain requirements of registration or licensure; and requiring the Maryland Cannabis Administration to deny a certain application or revoke a cannabis license or registration if the applicant, licensee, or registrant is determined by the Administration to be in violation of the Act or convicted of a violation of the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2024
Legislative Date
1/12/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463924/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2024 1/12/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Cannabis Licensing and Registration - Use of Straw Ownership - Prohibition
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {463924/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cannabis Licensing and Registration - Use of Straw Ownership - Prohibition
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Finance 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2024 11:51 AM
Click to return on the top page