Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Patterson, D. Barnes, Brooks, Buckel, Henson, Jalisi, Krimm, Landis, Lisanti, McComas, Proctor, Rogers, Ruth, Valentino-Smith, Griffith, McKay, C. Branch, Thiam, Saab, R. Jones, Attar, Atterbeary, Boteler, Charles, Ebersole, Feldmark, Hartman, Hornberger, D. Jones, Long, and Rose
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Purple Star Schools Program to recognize public schools that provide strong services and support for military-connected students and their families when, as a result of military service, a military-connected student transfers schools; establishing certain minimum criteria to qualify as a Purple Star School; and authorizing a public school to partner with the county board to fulfill the Department requirements to qualify as a Purple Star School under the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0234
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0782 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263523/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {263523/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (123-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
(   7-129 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:13 PM
Click to return on the top page