Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Diapers and Other Baby Products - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Jones, Crosby, Attar, Atterbeary, C. Branch, Charles, Ebersole, Feldmark, Griffith, Guyton, Hartman, Hornberger, Ivey, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, Patterson, Rose, and Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting the sale of diapers, diaper rash cream, and baby wipes from the sales and use tax.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0316
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0040 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613527/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Mangione) Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {573427/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers and Other Baby Products - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers and Other Baby Products - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {613527/1 Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Mangione) Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2022 2/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
House 3/04/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Floor Amendment {573427/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (123-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers and Other Baby Products - Exemption
Post Passage 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers and Other Baby Products - Exemption
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:13 PM
Click to return on the top page