Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Federal Police and Criminal Investigators
Sponsored by
Delegate D. Jones
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the definition of "disabled law enforcement officer or rescue worker" for purposes of certain county or municipal corporation property tax credits to include an individual who became disabled as a result of or in the course of employment as a certain police officer, detective, or investigator for a federal government agency; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0983
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Elfreth, Young and Eckardt)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Elfreth, Young and Eckardt)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates D. Barnes, C. Branch and Patterson)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates D. Barnes, C. Branch and Patterson)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Federal Police and Criminal Investigators
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Federal Police and Criminal Investigators
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {443829/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Senate Refuses Recede 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Elfreth, Young and Eckardt) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Refuses Recede 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Elfreth, Young and Eckardt) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates D. Barnes, C. Branch and Patterson) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates D. Barnes, C. Branch and Patterson) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/21/2022 9:18 AM
Click to return on the top page