Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hotel Rental Tax - Limitation of Municipal Authority to Tax Small Hotels - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Barve, and Gilchrist
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a limitation on the authority of certain municipalities to impose a hotel rental tax on hotels with 10 or fewer sleeping rooms.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0466
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-17)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted (39-6)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-8)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Hotel Rental Tax - Limitation of Municipal Authority to Tax Small Hotels - Repeal
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Hotel Rental Tax - Limitation of Municipal Authority to Tax Small Hotels - Repeal
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (123-17) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted (39-6) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (39-8) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Text - Chapter - Hotel Rental Tax - Limitation of Municipal Authority to Tax Small Hotels - Repeal
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page