Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Service Facilities - Automated External Defibrillator Program (Joe Sheya Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the owner and operator of a food service facility with an annual gross income greater than $400,000 to develop and, beginning on January 1, 2025, to implement an automated external defibrillator program that meets specified requirements; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health and the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems jointly to adopt certain regulations.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0299
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1194 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2023
Legislative Date
1/29/2023
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2023
Legislative Date
2/07/2023
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2023
Legislative Date
2/08/2023
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Text - First - Food Service Facilities - Automated External Defibrillator Program (Joe Sheya Act)
House 1/29/2023 1/29/2023 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/07/2023 2/07/2023 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/08/2023 2/08/2023 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
(   21-330.3 )
Last Updated: 2/15/2023 9:08 AM
Click to return on the top page