Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Sponsored by
Delegate Charles
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Entering into the Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact; stating the purpose of the Compact; requiring a state to meet certain requirements to participate in the Compact; requiring certain audiologists and speech-language pathologists to meet certain eligibility requirements to exercise the privilege to practice; requiring member states to recognize the right of an audiologist or a speech-language pathologist to practice via telehealth under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0183
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1112 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/16/2020
Legislative Date
9/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {666382/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/16/2020 9/16/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {666382/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Text - Chapter - Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:34 PM
Click to return on the top page