Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Sponsored by
Delegate Atterbeary
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making certain provisions of law relating to the filing, issuance, and modification of certain peace orders and to the shielding of certain court records of certain peace order proceedings apply to certain peace orders filed by certain employers on the basis of certain acts committed against certain employees at the employees' workplace; requiring an employer to notify an employee before the employer files a certain petition; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0105
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0846 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021, October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/09/2020
Legislative Date
10/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-4)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {938771/1
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {938771/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Shetty and Williams)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Shetty and Williams)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Sydnor, Hettleman and Carter)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Sydnor, Hettleman and Carter)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Conference Committee Report {463729/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Conference Committee Report {463729/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/09/2020 10/09/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-4) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {938771/1 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments {938771/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 House Requests Senate Recede 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Shetty and Williams) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 House Requests Senate Recede 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Shetty and Williams) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Refuses Recede 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Sydnor, Hettleman and Carter) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Senate Refuses Recede 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Sydnor, Hettleman and Carter) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Conference Committee Report {463729/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Conference Committee Report {463729/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Last Updated: 5/3/2021 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page