Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Davis, Bartlett, Crutchfield, and J. Long
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Office of the Correctional Ombudsman; authorizing the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board to make a recommendation for the distribution of money from the Performance Incentive Grant Fund to the Office; requiring the Office to conduct investigations, reviews, and assessments of administrative acts taken by the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, by the Department of Juvenile Services, or in relation to individuals confined by either department; providing for the confidentiality of certain communications; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0134
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0064 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Correctional Ombudsman Unit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-32)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Correctional Ombudsman Unit
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {693322/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
House 4/03/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (103-32) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Referred Rules 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
(   6-401 through 6-406,   9-3201,   9-3207,   9-3801 through 9-3808, 9-3811 through 9-3813, 9-3814, 9-3815, 9-3816 )
Last Updated: 4/10/2024 12:09 PM
Click to return on the top page