Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
Sponsored by
Delegates Bartlett, Acevero, Cardin, Crutchfield, Forbes, Griffith, D. Jones, Lopez, Moon, Pasteur, Phillips, Simmons, Simpson, Taylor, Williams, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering procedures that a law enforcement officer and a court are required to follow when the law enforcement officer or court has reason to believe that a child who has been detained is a victim of sex trafficking or a victim of human trafficking; providing that a minor may not be criminally prosecuted or proceeded against under certain provisions of law for a certain offense if the minor committed the offense as a direct result of being a victim of sex trafficking or being a victim of human trafficking; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0292
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0833 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2023
Legislative Date
2/22/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2023
Legislative Date
2/24/2023
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
House 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/22/2023 2/22/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
House 2/24/2023 2/24/2023 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2023 2/24/2023 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33AClick to view Recorded Media
(   1-402 )
Last Updated: 3/28/2023 3:48 PM
Click to return on the top page