Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the definition of "technology-based business" to include a technology-based nonprofit organization exempt from taxation under § 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code for purposes of the Maryland Technology Internship Program; and altering from 3.0 to 2.5 the cumulative grade point average that a certain individual must maintain or have maintained during a certain academic year to qualify for participation in the Maryland Technology Internship Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0079 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/09/2020
Legislative Date
7/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Hester) Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/09/2020 7/09/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Hester) Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Text - Chapter - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page