Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Plastic Bag Reduction Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after July 1, 2022, a certain retail establishment from distributing plastic carryout bags to a customer at the point of sale; providing that, on or after July 1, 2022, only the State may enact a law or take other action to prohibit, restrict, or regulate the use of certain plastic bags by a retail establishment, that certain authority of a county or municipality is preempted, and that certain laws or ordinances are superseded; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0223
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0209 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/08/2020
Legislative Date
9/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Plastic Bag Reduction Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/08/2020 9/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Plastic Bag Reduction Act
House 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/13/2021 9:27 AM