Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law – Truancy
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, Angel, Barron, Ebersole, Hettleman, Lafferty, J. Lewis, Sanchez, A. Washington, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 706
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering to under 16 years of age rather than 18 years, the age range for which a certain charge relating to truancy is applicable; reducing the maximum terms of imprisonment from 10 to 3 days for a first conviction and 30 to 5 days for subsequent convictions under the Act; authorizing the imposition of community service on conviction of certain charges related to truancy; and altering the application of a certain affirmative defense relating to a certain truancy charge.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0160
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Truancy - Affirmative Defense
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {842310/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Law – Truancy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {738072/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Atterbeary and Corderman)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Atterbeary and Corderman)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Motion Recede (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Committee Amendment {738072/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 706
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Law – Truancy
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Truancy - Affirmative Defense
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {842310/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Law – Truancy
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {738072/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Atterbeary and Corderman) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates J. Lewis, Atterbeary and Corderman) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Motion Recede (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Committee Amendment {738072/1 Withdrawn 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Senate Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 706
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Law – Truancy
(   7-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page