Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of a certain grant to certain counties under certain circumstances; increasing to 2.25% the minimum rate a county shall impose on an individual's Maryland taxable income; requiring a county, with regard to any increase to its county income tax rate that is effective on or after January 1, 2022, to impose the increase on an income bracket basis; authorizing a county to request information from the Comptroller to assist in determining income brackets and income tax rates that are revenue-neutral; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0133
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/01/2020
Legislative Date
10/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {695162/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {713120/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (42-94)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {753429/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (48-88)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {379934/1
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {379934/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {223726/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {113727/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (20-26)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {713323/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (19-27)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-17)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-37)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/01/2020 10/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing canceled
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {695162/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Floor Amendment {713120/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (42-94) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Floor Amendment {753429/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (48-88) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {379934/1 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {379934/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Floor Amendment {223726/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Floor Amendment {113727/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (20-26) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Floor Amendment {713323/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (19-27) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (30-17) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (94-37) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
Last Updated: 5/10/2021 9:44 AM
Click to return on the top page