Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Overdose Awareness
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Jones and Williams
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim August 31 as Overdose Awareness Day as part of a global event that aims to raise awareness of drug overdoses, reduce the stigma of drug-related death, and acknowledge the grief felt by families and friends of those who have died or been injured as a result of a drug overdose.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0100
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0936 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Overdose Awareness
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Overdose Awareness
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:14 PM
Click to return on the top page