Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Home- and Community-Based Services for Children and Youth
Sponsored by
Delegates Bagnall, Allen, Foley, Guyton, Healey, Hill, D. Jones, Kaufman, McCaskill, Pruski, Ruth, Simmons, Simpson, Taveras, Taylor, Terrasa, White, Woods, Ziegler, Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bhandari, Chisholm, Guzzone, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, and Szeliga
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to expand access to and provide reimbursement for intensive in-home services, case management, and wraparound services; requiring, beginning in fiscal year 2024, the Behavioral Health Administration to fund 100 slots in the mental health case management program for children or youth at risk of out-of-home placement who are not eligible for program services; requiring the Governor to include funding in the annual budget bill for customized goods and services for certain youth; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0255
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2023
Legislative Date
2/07/2023
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2023
Legislative Date
3/29/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {773629/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2023
Legislative Date
3/20/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2023
Legislative Date
3/21/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/30/2023
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/30/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/30/2023
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/03/2023
Legislative Date
5/03/2023
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Public Health - Home- and Community-Based Services for Children and Youth
House 2/07/2023 2/07/2023 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Favorable with Amendments {563622/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Home- and Community-Based Services for Children and Youth
House 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Finance 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2023 3/29/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2023 3/20/2023 Favorable with Amendments {773629/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2023 3/20/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2023 3/21/2023 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2023 3/30/2023 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2023 3/30/2023 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2023 3/30/2023 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Health - Home- and Community-Based Services for Children and Youth
Post Passage 5/03/2023 5/03/2023 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Home- and Community-Based Services for Children and Youth
(   15-1101 through 15-1103 )
Last Updated: 5/10/2023 11:29 AM
Click to return on the top page