Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing
Sponsored by
Delegates Henson, Bagnall, Bartlett, Brooks, Crutchfield, Dumais, Ivey, Moon, and Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a sentence for a conviction under a provision of law prohibiting a parent from willfully failing to provide for the support of his or her minor child to run concurrently with a sentence for any other conviction under the same provision of law imposed against the parent.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0394
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0148 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2020
Legislative Date
10/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/15/2020 10/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing
(   10-203 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page