Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating the State Board of Common Ownership Community Managers in the Maryland Department of Labor to oversee the licensing of community managers who provide management services for common ownership communities; providing the purpose of the Board is to adopt rules of conduct for licensees, establish training programs for the issuing of certain licenses, and education for individuals who have been issued a certain license; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to allocate up to $100,000 for the Board in fiscal year 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0592 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2020
Legislative Date
10/02/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-27)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/02/2020 10/02/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (101-27) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 3/04/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
(   22-101 through 22-802 )
(   2-106.15, 2-106.16, 2-108 )
(   11-130.1, 11B-115.2 )
Last Updated: 6/1/2021 1:03 PM
Click to return on the top page