Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Board of Elections from approving a contract with an election service provider unless the contract requires the election service provider to report to the State Administrator of Elections if any stage in the manufacturing of a component of the provider's election system occurred outside the United States or if any material change to a component in any stage in the manufacturing of an election system occurred outside the United States; requiring the State Administrator to forward the report within 5 days; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0392 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/10/2020
Legislative Date
7/10/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714533/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {713028/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/10/2020 7/10/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {714533/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Floor Amendment {713028/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
(   2-110 )
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 11:30 AM
Click to return on the top page