Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment; requiring the Commission to study certain matters regarding student behavioral health and mental health treatment and make recommendations on actions necessary to improve current student behavioral health practices and programs; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021, and December 1, 2022; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1443 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/4/2021 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page