Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing employees of the Maryland Agricultural and Resource-Based Industry Development Corporation and the Maryland Clean Energy Center to enroll and participate in the health insurance benefit options established under the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to determine whether the entities are eligible to participate in the Program within 60 days of the effective date of the Act; and requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to submit a certain report.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0417
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2022
Legislative Date
1/30/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683828/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-7)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
House 1/30/2022 1/30/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {693727/1 Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
House 3/03/2022 2/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {683828/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (126-7) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Text - Chapter - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Eligibility for Enrollment and Participation (Independent Agency Health Insurance Option Act)
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:15 PM
Click to return on the top page