Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Emergency Medical Services Board - Licenses and Certificates - Application Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Fraser-Hidalgo, Kaufman, Pena-Melnyk, and Shetty
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Board from requiring an applicant to provide proof that the applicant is lawfully present in the United States or have a Social Security number or Individual Taxpayer Identification Number as a condition for licensure or certification; and requiring the EMS Board to require applicants for a license or certificate to disclose certain information or provide alternative documentation and record the information in the applicant's file for a certain purpose.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0374
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-38)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-10)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2024
Legislative Date
4/09/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Emergency Medical Services Board - Licenses and Certificates - Application Requirements
House 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Emergency Medical Services Board - Licenses and Certificates - Application Requirements
House 2/29/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (101-38) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2024 2/20/2024 Referred Finance 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Third Reading Passed (34-10) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2024 4/09/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page