Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bond Sales - Notification of the Public
Sponsored by
Delegate Watson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of Public Works and the State Treasurer to provide public notice of a public sale of State bonds by The Municipal Market Monitor (TM3) or a similar service or such other method deemed appropriate by the State Treasurer.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0152
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Bond Sales - Notification of the Public
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2023
Legislative Date
2/27/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2023
Legislative Date
2/25/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Bond Sales - Notification of the Public
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2023
Legislative Date
2/27/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Bond Sales - Notification of the Public
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2023 2/27/2023 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/28/2023 2/25/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Bond Sales - Notification of the Public
House 3/02/2023 2/27/2023 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2023 2/28/2023 Referred Budget and Taxation 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/6/2023 11:35 AM
Click to return on the top page