Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a procurement officer, in an invitation for bids or a request for proposals, to include a certain summary of the factors used to determine the expected degree of minority business enterprise participation for the contract; requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs, in collaboration with certain entities, to adopt by regulation criteria used to determine that a prime contractor has persistently failed to meet contract goals; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0487
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-3)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {713920/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-3) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2022 3/24/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:15 PM
Click to return on the top page