Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sponsored by
Delegates Hartman, Boyce, Arentz, Feldmark, Kerr, Lisanti, and Love
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person who is at least 13 years old, a corporation, a partnership, an association, a nonprofit entity, the State, or any unit or political subdivision of the State from knowingly and intentionally releasing, or causing to be released, a balloon into the atmosphere, with certain exceptions; prohibiting a person from organizing or participating in a mass balloon release of 10 or more balloons; requiring a certain unit of a local government with delegated enforcement authority to report certain violations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0716
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0028 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {930110/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-34)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {194539/1
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {194539/1 (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {903328/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-35)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {930110/1 Adopted 10AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (94-34) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {194539/1 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable with Amendments {194539/1 (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Floor Amendment {903328/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (41-6) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (103-35) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610
Text - Chapter - Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
(   9-2301 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:15 PM
Click to return on the top page