Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Evidence - Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Fair Housing Testing
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that it is lawful for a person to intercept a wire, oral, or electronic communication if the person is working as a fair housing tester for a fair housing testing program operated by the federal government, the State, a local government, or a nonprofit civil rights organization under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0057
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2024
Legislative Date
1/23/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Evidence - Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Fair Housing Testing
House 1/23/2024 1/23/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:56 PM
Click to return on the top page