Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Crutchfield, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Office of the Inspector General in the Maryland Department of Health to be the Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health and providing that the Office is an independent unit of the State, rather than a unit in the Department; requiring an annual report by December 1 of the Office's activities investigating fraud and waste of certain funds, referrals to the Medicaid Fraud Control Unit, recoveries of mistaken claims paid in error, recoveries of the cost of benefits mistakenly paid, and regulatory changes; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0012
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0609 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/09/2020
Legislative Date
7/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/09/2020 7/09/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 11:41 AM