Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a local school system from charging a student a fee for enrollment in a summer school course if the student attends a school in the local school system, credit for the course is a high school graduation requirement, and the student has previously taken the course, but did not successfully complete or receive credit for the course.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1194 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/21/2020
Legislative Date
10/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-6)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/21/2020 10/21/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-6) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
(   7-211 )
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:35 PM
Click to return on the top page