Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to develop and publish on its website a searchable map of zones of dewatering influence; defining "zones of dewatering influence" as the area around a surface mine in karst terrain; requiring a contract for the sale of real property in Baltimore County, Carroll County, Frederick County, or Washington County include a notice about property located in a certain zone; establishing that a purchaser of real property that does not receive the required notice has a right to rescind a contract; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0178 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/26/2020
Legislative Date
8/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/26/2020 8/26/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 3/04/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Text - Chapter - Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page