Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 444
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from engaging in the business of inspecting an on-site sewage disposal system unless the person holds a valid on-site wastewater property transfer inspection license issued by the Department of the Environment on or after July 1, 2022; requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations by January 1, 2022; providing an administrative penalty of up to $10,000 for a violation of the Act; providing that each inspection knowingly conducted without a valid license constitutes a separate violation of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0022
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021, January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/25/2020
Legislative Date
8/25/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {610718/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-29)
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {463027/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-10)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-26)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 444
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/25/2020 8/25/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {610718/1 Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (103-29) 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hough) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Floor Amendment {463027/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (37-10) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (112-26) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 444
Text - Chapter - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 11:58 AM
Click to return on the top page