Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Reports on Standing Orders and Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, Taveras, and Woods
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on current opioid overdose reversal drugs and, for any current opioid overdose reversal drug approved by the federal Food and Drug Administration, whether the Department has added the drug to a standing order and, if not, the reasons why the drug has not been added; and requiring the report to be submitted by December 1, 2024, December 1, 2025, and December 1, 2026.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0408
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs - Standing Orders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {413620/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs - Standing Orders
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments {413620/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Reports on Standing Orders and Opioid Overdose Reversal Drugs
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Finance 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 4:10 PM
Click to return on the top page