Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees MC 19-21
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Montgomery County, for the 2020-2021 licensing period, to refund holders of certain alcoholic beverages licenses the entire amount of the annual license fee and to refund holders of certain other alcoholic beverages licenses a certain amount of the annual license fee for the 2021-2022 licensing period; and requiring the Board, for the 2021-2022 licensing period, to waive the late fee for certain alcoholic beverages licenses.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453490/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees MC 19-21
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Favorable with Amendments {453490/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees MC 19-21
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees MC 19-21
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:35 PM
Click to return on the top page