Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit
Sponsored by
Delegate Cox
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain prohibition on receiving credit in the State Retirement and Pension System for certain military service.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page