Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mechanics' Liens - Design Services
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that if the owner of specified land or the owner's agent contracts for the provision of specified services, the land and any improvements are subject to the establishment of a mechanics' lien for the payment of all debts, without regard to the amount, contracted for work done and materials furnished for or about a building, whether or not a building on the land is erected, repaired, rebuilt, or improved; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0323
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page