Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Suicide Treatment Improvements Act
Sponsored by
Delegate K. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to provide training for certain staff who assist callers on a certain hotline to ensure that the staff are able to provide counseling for suicidal persons who may be in crisis; requiring certain facilities to ensure that suicidal patients and patients who have attempted suicide are treated in a certain manner; requiring certain facilities to ensure that certain staff act in a certain manner and receive certain training; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0557
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Suicide Treatment Improvements Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Suicide Treatment Improvements Act
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:37 PM
Click to return on the top page